MA S161 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to charitable alcohol donations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to charitable alcohol donations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4697 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2935 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2935 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S161.pdf |