MA S1604 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1573
Note: Replaces legislation H1614
Note: Replaces legislation H1614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide interest rate parity. Revenue.
Title
Providing interest rate parity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-10 | House | Accompanied by S1573, H1550 and H1614 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1410 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S213 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S392 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1550 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1573 (Replaces) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H1614 (Replaces) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S517 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H485 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H878 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S213 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S392 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1550 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1573 (Replaces) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H1614 (Replaces) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S517 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H258 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
H485 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H878 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1604.pdf |