MA H485 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit benefit limits and exclusions for behavioral health disorders on certain disability insurance policies. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring mental health parity for disability policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-12-05JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 10:30AM-1:00PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S517 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H482 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2018
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback