MA H482 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S545

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit discrimination in the issuance of group or individual disability, accident or sickness insurance policies. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for equitable coverage in disability policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2018-07-30HouseRules suspended
2018-07-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-03HouseRules suspended
2018-07-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-06-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-06-18HouseAccompanied by S545
2018-05-17SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-01-09JointHearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H497 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H587 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4333
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H4110 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S545 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied H482
H4865 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback