MA S1515 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2264
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Accompanied H2264 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2264 (Replaced by) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2264 (Replaced by) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1515.pdf |