MA S1454 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2692

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to streamline COVID-19 vaccination sign-up in Massachusetts. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlining COVID-19 vaccination sign-up in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-14SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2692
2021-06-25JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1897 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Senate concurred
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S250 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Senate concurred
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback