MA S1452 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to health education in women's correctional institutions. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to health education in women's correctional institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1484 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S918 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3327 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1484 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S918 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3327 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1452 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1452.pdf |