MA S144 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce regulations for hair braiders. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Reducing regulations for hair braiders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S144 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S144.pdf |