MA S1405 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to HIV routine screening and care. Public Health.
Title
Relative to HIV routine screening and care
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-02-15 | House | Accompanied by H2347 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1637 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2422 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1483 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3052
S1471 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2412 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2338 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1471
S376 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S369
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H2347 (Replaces) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1405
H2285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2422 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1483 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3052
S1471 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2412 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2338 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1471
S376 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S369
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H2347 (Replaces) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1405
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1405.pdf |