MA S376 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to the screen prospective school employees for prior investigations into child abuse or sexual misconduct. Education.
Title
Relative to the screening of prospective school employees for prior investigations into child abuse or sexual misconduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Accompanied S369 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2616 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1471 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H2338 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1471
S1405 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1485 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S91 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S369 (Replaced by) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H1485 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S943 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H2616 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1471 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S894 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H2338 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1471
S1405 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1485 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S91 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S369 (Replaced by) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1151 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H1485 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S943 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S376 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S376.pdf |