MA H2285 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. Fiola of Fall River, a petition of Carole A. Fiola and others that the Division of Medical Assistance be directed to provide coverage for screenings for postpartum depression. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to postpartum depression screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-12-02HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2021-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S658 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H1191 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred
S1290 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S803 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S1695 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4508

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback