MA S1361 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to 3D printed weapons and “ghost guns”. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to 3D printed weapons and “ghost guns”
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2649 |
2019-08-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-08-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S224 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
S113 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H286
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1268 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2446
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1278 (Similar To) 2020-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2751
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2358 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2391 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - See H4087
S2400 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Amendment #1 (Lawn) adopted
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
S2649 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S113 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H286
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1268 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2446
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1278 (Similar To) 2020-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2751
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2358 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2391 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - See H4087
S2400 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Amendment #1 (Lawn) adopted
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
S2649 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1361 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1361.pdf |