MA S1325 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the reform of the personal care attendant system. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the reform of the personal care attendant system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2547
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H1502 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S940 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2373 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2387 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S50 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H803 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H664 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2181 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2267 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H4087 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2019
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback