MA S1189 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the local infrastructure development program. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To improve the local infrastructure development program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3814 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3814 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1189 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1189.pdf |