MA S79 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote sustainable development across the Commonwealth. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Promoting sustainable development across the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1924 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1602 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3941 (Similar To) 2019-07-23 - New draft substituted, see H3987
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1924 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1602 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3941 (Similar To) 2019-07-23 - New draft substituted, see H3987
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S79 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S79.pdf |