MA H3941 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - New draft substituted, see H3987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - New draft substituted, see H3987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to GreenWorks
Title
Relative to GreenWorks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | New draft substituted, see H3987 |
2019-07-23 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2019-07-23 | House | Amendment (H3972) rejected |
2019-07-23 | House | Read second |
2019-07-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendments pending |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending |
2019-07-23 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3987 |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2019-07-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3972 |
2019-06-28 | House | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2019-06-27 | House | New draft of H3846 |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported from the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3846 (Replaces) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3972 (Replaced by) 2019-07-23 - Rejected
H3987 (Replaced by) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3988 (Similar To) 2019-07-23 - See H3987
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3972 (Replaced by) 2019-07-23 - Rejected
H3987 (Replaced by) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3988 (Similar To) 2019-07-23 - See H3987
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3941.pdf |