MA S1158 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied H2171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied H2171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to certain tanks used for the storage of fluids. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to certain tanks used for the storage of fluids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Accompanied H2171 |
2013-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2171 (Replaced by) 2013-07-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1158 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1158.pdf |