MA S1101 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve access to naloxone. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Improving access to naloxone
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4470 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-21 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday May 4, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 7, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S509 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S514 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S550 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S553 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H4470 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4921 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S514 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S550 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S553 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H526 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H4470 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4921 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1101 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1101.pdf |