MA H526 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing certain health insurance coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for certain health insurance coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-31HouseRules suspended
2018-07-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-07-31HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-05-21HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-19HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H37 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H886 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback