MA H883 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2170

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to indigent defense counsel. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to indigent defense counsel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-02SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2170
2017-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H164 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1932 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1056 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H713 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H351 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2302 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H886 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H54 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4809 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback