MA H4470 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For Prevention and Access to Appropriate Care and Treatment of Addiction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For Prevention and Access to Appropriate Care and Treatment of Addiction

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseNew draft substituted, see H4725
2018-07-10HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2018-07-10HouseRules suspended
2018-07-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2018-07-10HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-07-10HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4725
2018-07-10HouseOrder adopted, see H4722
2018-06-18HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-06-07HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2018-05-07HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2018-05-07HouseNew draft of S1007, S1092, S1099, S1100, S1101, S1114, H1066, H2391, H2396, H2404, H3206, H3511, H3594, H4033, H4337, H4363 and H4380
2018-05-07HouseReported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1007 (Replaces) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
S1102 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H4033 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H4722 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Adopted, see H4470
H4725 (Replaced by) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback