MA H4033 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4470

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Message from [BACKING TEXT].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to combatting addiction, accessing treatment, reducing prescriptions, and enhancing prevention

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4470
2018-03-22SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseAmendment (changing reporting date to Friday May 4, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 7, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-01-03JointHearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-11-20SenateSenate concurred
2017-11-15HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H4470 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2400 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H531 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1103 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
H220 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4722 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Adopted, see H4470
H4725 (Similar To) 2018-07-11 - Published as amended, see H4742
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
S2609 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4784 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
S2623 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - See H4742
H4844 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback