MA S1056 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the retention of retail workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Providing for the retention of retail workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S826 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1284 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3352 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H734 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
S1284 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3352 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H734 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1056 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1056.pdf |