MA S826 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend G.L. c. 221 § 27A: Obsolete or useless papers; disposition, destruction or storage. The Judiciary.
Title
To Amend G.L. c. 221 § 27A: Obsolete or useless papers; disposition, destruction or storage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S306 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
H3072 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2337 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S306 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
H3072 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2337 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S826 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S826.pdf |