MA S1008 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the penalties for hazing by secondary or post secondary students residing in residential schools designated as handicapped housing. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to school hazing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1008 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1008.pdf |