MA H997 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of licensed mental health professionals under certain insurance laws. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to increasing consumer access to licensed rehabilitation counselors
Sponsors
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1158 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H997 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H997.pdf |