MA H988 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4852
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a mattress recycling program in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To establish a mattress recycling program in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4852 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S570 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
S569 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
H4852 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2922 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S569 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
H4852 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2922 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H988 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H988.pdf |