MA H981 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2156
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to financial services contracts for dental benefits corporations. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to financial services contracts for dental benefits corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2156 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2156 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H981 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H981.pdf |