MA H957 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4039
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize insurance companies to withhold payments for punitive, exemplary or multiple damages unless provided for in the contract. Financial Services.
Title
To encourage full insurance coverage of claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4039 |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Replaced by) 2014-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H2861
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H957 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H957.pdf |