MA H892 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the building or expansion of solid waste disposal facilities. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting public drinking water in building or expansion of solid waste disposal facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H958 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H2667 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H931 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S510 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1728 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2667 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H931 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S510 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1728 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H892.pdf |