MA H860 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission to study whether Willett Pond and its appurtenances should be deeded to the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a commission to study Willett Pond

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17JointHearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2019-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1861 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2221 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - House concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback