MA H807 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3950
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3950
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3950
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote efficiency in the use of certain natural resources. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to expanding resource efficiency in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
Rep. Matthew Beaton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3950 |
2013-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-07-03 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2013-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-04-03 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3950 (Replaced by) 2014-03-31 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H807 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H807.pdf |