MA H753 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4228
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to agricultural disaster relief. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to agricultural disaster relief
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4228 |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Agriculture |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S490 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4228
H4228 (Replaced by) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4228 (Replaced by) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H753 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H753.pdf |