MA H72 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to making appropriations for fiscal year 2017 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects. February 17, 2017.
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2017 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported, in part, by H3808 |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported, in part, by H3718 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported, in part, by H3448 |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H68 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H74 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3935
H2777 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4699
H3539 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2177 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2179
S2179 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H4516 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H4941 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H68 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H74 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3935
H2777 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4699
H3539 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2177 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2179
S2179 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H4516 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H4941 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H72 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H72.pdf |