MA H4941 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4930
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendations of amendments to sections 20, 38, 59 and 60 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for fiscal year 2018 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4930, amended), and recommending certain new supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year 2018. October 25, 2018.
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with recommendations of amendments to sections 20, 38, 59 and 60 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for fiscal year 2018 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4930, amended), and recommending certain new supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year 2018. October 25, 2018.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-10-29 | House | See H4930 |
Same As/Similar To
S2665 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2018
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
H4938 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
H4930 (Replaced by) 2018-10-29 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4940 for sections 59 and 60
H4939 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4940 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5009 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 368 of the Acts of 2018
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
H4938 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
H4930 (Replaced by) 2018-10-29 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4940 for sections 59 and 60
H4939 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4940 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5009 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 368 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4941.pdf |