MA H4938 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4841
Note: Legislation replaced by H4941
Note: Legislation replaced by H4941
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 20 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for fiscal year 2018 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 4930, amended), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment A of House, No. 4941). October 25, 2018.
Title
Relative to the prescription monitoring program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Re-enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-12-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | Senate | House amendment adopted, as amended (Lovely) S2691 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Lovely) adopted S2691 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-10-29 | House | Amendment adopted |
2018-10-29 | House | Governors amendment rejected |
2018-10-29 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2018-10-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-10-29 | House | For message, see H4941, Attachment A |
2018-10-29 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2018-10-29 | House | Enacted as section 20 of H4930 |
Same As/Similar To
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
S2665 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2018
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
H4841 (Replaced by) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 337 of the Acts of 2018
H4941 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2665 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2018
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
H4841 (Replaced by) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 337 of the Acts of 2018
H4941 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4938 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4938.pdf |