MA S2480 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2372
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - See S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - See S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Garden of Peace (see Senate, No. 2372).
Title
Relative to the Garden of Peace
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | See S2372 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Recommended amendment to S2372 |
Same As/Similar To
S2372 (Replaced by) 2018-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 91 of the Acts of 2018
H2306 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1711 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2450 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2554
H4832 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4833 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2306 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1711 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2450 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2554
H4832 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4833 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2480 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2480.pdf |