MA H4516 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the municipal police training fund
Title
Relative to the municipal police training fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-18 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 412 (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-18 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 351 (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-18 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 351 (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-18 | House | Enacted - 144 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 412) |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #446 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 149 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 351) |
2018-05-23 | House | Read third |
2018-05-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-21 | House | Reported on a part of H4231 |
2018-05-21 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H3600 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Published as amended, see H3601
H4941 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4938 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H3600 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Published as amended, see H3601
H4941 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4938 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2018