MA H1 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3600

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A message from His Excellency the Governor submitting the annual budget of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017 (House, No. 1).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MAKING APPROPRIATIONS FOR THE FISCAL YEAR 2018 FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE DEPARTMENTS, BOARDS, COMMISSIONS, INSTITUTIONS, AND CERTAIN ACTIVITIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH, FOR INTEREST, SINKING FUND, AND SERIAL BOND REQUIREMENTS, AND FOR CERTAIN PERMANENT IMPROVEMENTS

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseReported in part, see H3600
2017-01-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H57 (Similar To) 2017-01-17 - Read for its information and returned to the House
H68 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
H69 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - See H58
H73 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Reported, in part, by H2783
H72 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - No further action taken
H74 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3935
H2777 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4699
H3539 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3600 (Replaced by) 2017-04-25 - Published as amended, see H3601
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3655 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
H3656 (Similar To) 2017-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2017
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3675 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See H3450
H3601 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Reported, in part, by H3800
S2076 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S2087 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3770 (Similar To) 2018-04-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4432
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
H3808 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2017
H3800 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Item 8910-0108 passed over veto - see Roll Call #298 [YEAS 32 to NAYS 6]
H3830 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - No further action taken
H3869 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - Adopted, see H3600
H4160 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H4284 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4520 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback