MA S2076 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3601
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - See H3601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - See H3601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2018 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions, and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund, and serial bond requirements, and for certain permanent improvements
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2018 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions, and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund, and serial bond requirements, and for certain permanent improvements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | See H3601 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Text of S3 amended, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3601 (Replaced by) 2017-07-07 - Reported, in part, by H3800
H3600 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Published as amended, see H3601
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
S10 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Amendment again agreed to -- see Senate Roll Call #47 [YEAS 29 - NAYS 7] see House Roll Call #67 [YEAS 105 - NAYS 48]
S19 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
H3800 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Item 8910-0108 passed over veto - see Roll Call #298 [YEAS 32 to NAYS 6]
H3830 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4160 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H4231 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4516 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
H3600 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Published as amended, see H3601
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
S10 (Similar To) 2017-06-14 - Amendment again agreed to -- see Senate Roll Call #47 [YEAS 29 - NAYS 7] see House Roll Call #67 [YEAS 105 - NAYS 48]
S19 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - See H2019
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
H3800 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Item 8910-0108 passed over veto - see Roll Call #298 [YEAS 32 to NAYS 6]
H3830 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4160 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H4231 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4516 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2018
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2076 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2076.pdf |