MA H68 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reorganizing the Department of Public Safety. January 25, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reorganize the Department of Public Safety

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27 Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2017
2017-03-27HouseLaid aside as moot
2017-03-20HousePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next session, the question being "Shall this reorganization plan be approved?"
2017-03-06SenateFor majority report, see Senate, No. 2037
2017-03-06SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next session, the question being "Shall this reorganization plan be approved?"
2017-02-17JointHearing rescheduled to 02/22/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-02-16JointHearing scheduled for 02/22/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
2017-01-30SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H57 (Similar To) 2017-01-17 - Read for its information and returned to the House
H69 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - See H58
H73 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Reported, in part, by H2783
H72 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Reported, in part, by H3808
H74 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3935
H2777 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3655 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3656 (Similar To) 2017-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2017
H3671 (Similar To) 2017-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H3675 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See H3450
H3712 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
H3731 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Became Law pursuant to Article LXXXVII of the Amendment to the Constitution, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2017
S2087 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3770 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in University of Massachusetts Medical School
S2091 (Similar To) 2017-06-21 - See H3731

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback