MA H525 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for cervical cancer and women’s preventative health screenings. Financial Services.
Title
Regarding cervical cancer and women's preventative health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S1288 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2204
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
S788 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2260 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2018
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1288 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2204
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
S788 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H571 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2260 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2018
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H525 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H525.pdf |