MA S499 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to women’s health and economic equity. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing contraceptive coverage and economic security in our state (ACCESS)

Sponsors

Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Sen. Thomas McGee [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D]
Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Juana Matias [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]
Sen. James Timilty [D]Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D]Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]
Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-06SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2204
2017-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S544 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - House concurred
S957 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1318 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
S1055 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2
H536 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
S2204 (Replaced by) 2017-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2210 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - See H4009

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback