MA S1055 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to equity in the workplace. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to equity in the workplace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S957 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1013 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S685 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2204
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1013 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S685 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S499 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2204
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1055.pdf |