MA S788 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect girls from genital mutilation. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect girls from genital mutilation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1218 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
S14 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H679 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
H1170 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2671 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H3451 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H553 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2333 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback