MA H2333 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-16)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for the crime of female genital mutilation. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect girls from genital mutilation

Sponsors

Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]
Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Sen. Richard Ross [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Thomas McGee [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]
Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Keiko Orrall [R]
Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]
Rep. Kate Campanale [R]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Juana Matias [D]
Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback