MA S1218 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1178
Note: Replaces legislation S1271
Note: Replaces legislation S1271
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect youth from the health risks of tobacco and nicotine addiction. Public Health.
Title
To protect youth from the health risks of tobacco and nicotine addiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Accompanied H4486 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied by S1178, S1188, S1189 and S1271 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H4109 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
S1178 (Replaces) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1271 (Replaces) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H4471 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4479 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Published as amended, see H4486
H4486 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
H4784 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H4109 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
S1178 (Replaces) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1271 (Replaces) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H4471 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4479 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Published as amended, see H4486
H4486 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2018
H4784 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Text of an amendment, see H4486
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1218.pdf |