MA S1178 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the age of tobacco purchase. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the age of tobacco purchase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied S1218 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1218 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
S1189 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1218 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied H4486
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1178 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1178.pdf |