MA S2260 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4766

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill negating archaic statutes targeting young women (Senate, No. 784),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2260).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Negating archaic statutes targeting young women

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-07-18 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 409 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #321 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2018
2018-07-19SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-07-19HouseEnacted
2018-07-19SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-07-19HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-07-18SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2018-07-18SenateRules suspended
2018-07-18HouseMotion to reconsider negatived
2018-07-18HousePassed to be engrossed - 138 YEAS to 9 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 409)
2018-07-18HouseRead third
2018-07-18HouseRules suspended
2018-07-17HouseRead second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4770) and ordered to a third reading
2018-07-17HouseRules suspended
2018-07-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment (H4770) pending
2018-07-17HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment (H4770) and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-07-17HouseOrder adopted, see H4766
2018-05-30HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-01-29HouseRead; and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2018-01-25SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #321 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0)
2018-01-25SenateRead third
2018-01-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-25SenateSubstituted as amended for S784
2018-01-25SenateAmendment #2 (Creem) adopted
2018-01-18SenateRecommended new draft for S784
2018-01-18SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H525 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H954 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S507 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2207 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4766 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Order adopted, see S2260

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback