MA H5187 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5151
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-15 - See H5151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-15 - See H5151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Massachusetts’ transportation resources and climate (see House, No. 5151). August 10, 2022.
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of sections 3, 3A, 25 and 26; his disapproval of certain wording contained item 6621-2208 contained in Section 2D, item 6720-2261 contained in Section 2F, and item 6720-2215 contained in Section 2G; and with recommendation of amendments to sections 20, 24, 32, 54 and 61 of the engrossed Bill relative to Massachusetts’ transportation resources and climate (see House, No. 5151). August 10, 2022
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | House | See H5151 |
Same As/Similar To
H5151 (Replaced by) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5186 for section 61
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4633 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Read for its information
H4361 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4362 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4996
H3862 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
H3871 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied H3973
H3773 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3827 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2021
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4633 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Read for its information
H4361 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4362 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4996
H3862 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
H3871 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied H3973
H3773 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3827 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5187 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5187.pdf |